NESTLE ROWNTREE EMPLOYEES COMMUNITY FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Community Fund is a charitable trust set up for the sole purpose of disbursing donations from York Nestle Employees to charitable organisations and other deserving causes. The Executive Committee represents membership of the fund and makes decisions on the donations based on their own knowledge and experience, awareness of membersÔÇÖ views and guidelines agreed by the committee.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 August 1985: Standard registration
- 11 July 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 06 January 2012: Re-registered
- 11 July 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- ROWNTREE MACKINTOSH EMPLOYEES COMMUNITY FUND TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £60 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 June 2023 | 242 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2023 | 607 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 June 2023 | 972 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 APRIL 1985.
Charitable objects
TO MAKE GRANTS: (A) TO ANY INSTITUTION, CORPORATE OR NOT, WHICH IS ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND REGISTERED AS A CHARITY UNDER THE CHARITIES ACT 1960; AND (B) FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window