THE DEVON FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES

Charity number: 1191427
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The WI exists to educate women, to enable them to provide an effective role in the community, expand their horizons and to develop and pass on skills. This is achieved through educational courses covering IT, cookery, craft, cultural pursuits, sport and health and many others. These are run by qualified tutors either at County level or our own Denman College.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £146,866
Total expenditure: £163,817

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 2020: CIO registration
  • 02 November 2021: Funds received from 291301 WEST ALVINGTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
  • 08 November 2021: Funds received from 1095770 SHEBBEAR WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
  • 08 December 2021: Funds received from 1019699 OGWELL WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
  • 11 July 2023: Funds received from 1016290 LUSTLEIGH WOMENS INSTITUTE
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Evelyn Graham Watson Chair 02 July 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY AND ST GABRIEL, STOKE GABRIEL, TOTNES.
Received: On time
STOKE GABRIEL VILLAGE HALL TRUSTEES
Received: On time
THE DEVON FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
Received: On time
Jo-Ann Middleton Trustee 19 June 2024
THE DEVON FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
Received: On time
Sarah Elizabeth Shorthouse Trustee 01 June 2021
THE DEVON FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
Received: On time
Pamela Joan Keane Mrs Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
ROSAMUND LYNN MATTERFACE Trustee 30 April 2019
None on record
Janet Mary Connolly Trustee 30 April 2019
None on record
RITA CHRISTINE NEBBETT Trustee 30 April 2019
SHALDON & RINGMORE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Received: On time
MARIE WINIFRED RHODES Trustee 30 April 2019
SHALDON & RINGMORE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £109.16k £199.35k £146.87k
Total expenditure £121.55k £154.92k £163.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 28 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 30 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 27 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 27 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE FIRS
HONITON ROAD
BLACKHORSE
EXETER
EX5 2FT
Phone:
01392255386