Trustees HEALTH DATA RESEARCH UK
Charity number: 1194431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dame Julie Moore | Chair | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patsy Wilkinson | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Claire Newland | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Bithell | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sir Mark Walport | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Andrew Elder | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Wilcox | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lord the Professor Ara Warkais Darzi | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Boa | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lord James Richard O'Shaughnessy | Trustee | 19 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sarah Helen Harper | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Alexander Fred Markham | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Professor James Cuthbert Smith FRS | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
|||||
PROF DAME JANET MAUREEN THORNTON | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.