MALMESBURY HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The society holds regular member meetings, hires speakers, supports education, research and publications on the history of the Malmesbury area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 25 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin John Holley | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Shipp | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anne Goodyer | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christina Staff | Trustee | 26 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Maria Marsh | Trustee | 26 January 2015 |
|
|||||
WILLIAM BARRON DENT | Trustee | 26 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.12k | £3.45k | £1.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.65k | £4.43k | £773 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 25 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY OF MALMESBURY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY HOLDING MEETINGS TO DISSEMINATE AND PROMOTE THE HISTORY OF THE LOCAL AREA IN A WIDER HISTORICAL CONTEXT TO THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC OF ALL AGES AND TO PUBLISH LOCAL HISTORY INFORMATION AND LIAISE WITH OTHER LOCAL GROUPS WHO HAVE A SIMILAR AIM. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORIZE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
MALMESBURY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Gastons Road
Malmesbury
SN16 0BD
- Phone:
- 01666822520
- Website:
-
malmesburyhistorysociety.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window