MINDWORKSUK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a counselling and psychotherapy charity that provides a low-cost contribution-based service to anyone in need of support in communities that would not usually access one to one talking therapies. Our counsellors speak many languages including English, Urdu, Bengali, Hindi, Punjabi, Gujarati, Arabic, Somali, Pashto, Farsi, French, Spanish Portuguese, Polish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2023
Total income includes £5,299 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAHAR BEG | Chair | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Mary Louise Al'Saedy | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ARSHAD HUSSEIN DAUD | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Ameepurva Thaker | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2021 | 01/09/2022 | 01/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.01k | £20.91k | £31.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.12k | £22.71k | £25.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.75k | £1.50k | £5.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | 11 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | 11 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF PEOPLE LIVING IN LONDON AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UK AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE, AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY PEOPLE FROM MARGINALISED COMMUNITIES, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF: A) ACCESS TO COUNSELLING AND COACHING, EITHER IN PERSON, ONLINE OR ON THE TELEPHONE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING, BUILD CAPACITY AND CONFIDENCE; B) TRAINING TO COUNSELLORS, THERAPISTS AND OTHER MENTAL HEALTH CARE PRACTITIONERS TO SUPPORT THE DELIVERY OF SERVICES WHICH ARE APPROPRIATE TO MEET THEIR NEEDS; C) THE PROVISION OF A SIGNPOSTING SERVICE TO EXTERNAL SOURCES OF SUPPORT, RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES, AND THE SUPPORT OF OTHER ORGANISATIONS WHOSE WORK INVOLVES ASSISTING MARGINALISED GROUPS OR THOSE WITH MENTAL HEALTH NEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 GATESIDE ROAD
LONDON
SW17 7NB
- Phone:
- 07590041749
- Email:
- admin@mindworksuk.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window