LITDRIVEUK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT FOR ENGLISH TEACHERS AND TUTORS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 October 2020: CIO registration
- LITDRIVE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Cass | Chair | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE KEENAN | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARCELLO GIOVANELLI | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Hannah Jones | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
EMILY MCALLISTER | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA MCKENZIE | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.72k | £31.15k | £45.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.81k | £9.65k | £29.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT TO ENGLISH TEACHERS OR TUTORS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Litdrive Uk
PO Box 11023
LEICESTER
LE19 9DY
- Phone:
- 01162345678
- Email:
- litdriveuk@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
Www.litdrive.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.