THE BLACK FUND

Charity number: 1193982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Prevention or relief of poverty of the African and Caribbean diaspora in the United Kingdom by making grants to charities and community groups.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £9,839
Total expenditure: £16,506

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 March 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Leigh-Anne Gray Chair 31 March 2021
None on record
Sarah Pinnock Trustee 31 March 2021
None on record
Andre Gray Trustee 31 March 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £84.14k £30.25k £9.84k
Total expenditure £56.23k £37.82k £16.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
c/o ADLER SHINE LLP
ASTON HOUSE
CORNWALL AVENUE
LONDON
N3 1LF
Phone:
02083713000