NORTHAMPTON TOWN OF SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the inclusion and welfare of refugees and asylum-seekers. Encouraging Northampton organisations and people to make a public commitment to becoming a place of welcome and safety. Encouraging our LAs to become a place of sacutuary To encourage and support local communities and voluntary, community and faith (VCF) organisations in welcoming and assisting asylum-seekers and refugees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £11,250 from 1 government contract(s) and £11,250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 30 October 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Graham Smith | Chair | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rufia Ashraf | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Jamal Alwahabi | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|||||
DANIELLE STONE MA | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.76k | £38.45k | £64.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.35k | £32.34k | £27.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £11.25k | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.05k | £15.00k | £11.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED ON 28 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘THE OBJECTS’) ARE (1) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS, SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION, BY PROMOTING AND/OR CO-ORDINATING, IN PARTNERSHIP WITH VOLUNTARY, COMMUNITY AND FAITH ORGANISATIONS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES TO ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT TO LIFE IN THE UK AND WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY. (2) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING AND GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN THE GENERAL PUBLIC, REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS AS PEOPLE SEEKING SANCTUARY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Marlborough House
32-36 Hazelwood Road
Northampton
NN1 1LN
- Phone:
- 07500930903
- Email:
- info@ntos.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window