Accounts and annual returns THE DERBYSHIRE SINGERS

Charity number: 516921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 July 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 06 July 2021 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 21 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 13 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 19 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 02 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window