FRIENDS OF YSGOL RHIW BECHAN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 20 October 2020: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Louise Davies | Chair | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Francis | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.82k | £3.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £170 | £12.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 329 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 329 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 October 2022 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (ÆTHE OBJECTSÆ) ARE THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN YSGOL RHIW BECHAN. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE ASSOCIATION MAY: -DEVELOP MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL -ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT. -PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY)
Contact information
- Address:
-
YSGOL RHIW BECHAN
TREGYNON
NEWTOWN
SY16 3EH
- Phone:
- 0168650410
- Email:
- friends_yrb@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window