Accounts and annual returns BARBADOS ASSOCIATION (LEEDS BRANCH)
Charity number: 516938
Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 99 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 99 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 465 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 465 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 830 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 830 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 March 2022 | 313 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 01 May 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window