BARBADOS ASSOCIATION (LEEDS BRANCH)

Charity number: 516938
Charity reporting is overdue by 147 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Total gross income £9.62k £12.11k £17.62k £8.41k £12.74k
Total expenditure £9.39k £9.97k £15.40k £11.02k £13.75k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A