Trustees SURVIVE

Charity number: 1191837
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Buckingham M. A. Chair 01 March 2015
None on record
Tracy Tomlinson Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
Carissa Tossell Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
Helen Gould Trustee 01 October 2016
None on record
Sally Lines Trustee 01 June 2012
None on record
Charlotte Walton Trustee 01 June 2000
None on record