SANDY HILL STUDIOS TRUST CIO

Charity number: 1193387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sandy Hill Arts encourages the public to enjoy the creative arts in Purbeck, especially visual arts and crafts. We will promote participation in the arts through exhibitions of new work, events, performance and education, as well as working with community groups and schools. We want the natural setting of the site to be a new visitor attraction in Purbeck.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Total income: £15,000
Total expenditure: £2,245

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 February 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • SANDY HILL ARTS (Working name)
  • SANDY HILL STUDIOS (Working name)
  • SANDY HILL STUDIOS TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Melissa Viney Chair 29 March 2020
None on record
David Christopher Lansbury Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Susan Elisabeth Western Trustee 22 April 2022
None on record
Susan Hill Lansbury Trustee 22 April 2022
None on record
Frances Pollard Trustee 28 February 2021
None on record
Richard Jeffery Trustee 29 March 2020
None on record
DESMOND RICHARD ROBIN SUTCLIFFE Trustee 29 March 2020
SWANAGE AND PURBECK DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
Emma Charlotte Ormond Trustee 20 March 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2022
Total gross income £15.00k
Total expenditure £2.25k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 28 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Sandy Hill Studios
Sandy Hill Lane
Corfe Castle
Dorset
BH20 5JF
Phone:
01929480977