THE CHURCH MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1- Relief of those in need 2- Religion 3- The prevention or relief of poverty 4- Christianity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 13 November 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OPEOLUWA ADEKUNLE BANJOKO | Chair | 15 April 2009 |
|
|
||||
DAVID USUNOBUN OSAZUWA | Trustee | 15 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.03k | £28.50k | £41.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.78k | £27.04k | £37.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 April 2024
(These accounts |
28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 APR 2009
Charitable objects
THE GENERAL ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CHURCH MINISTRY
32 EDWARD STREET
PRESTON
PR1 2XJ
- Phone:
- 07516680876
- Email:
- info@thechurchministry.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window