Financial history THE NORTH AND EAST YORKSHIRE MARK BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 517013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £24.99k £23.07k £29.14k £30.04k £25.00k
Total expenditure £20.75k £22.80k £27.27k £31.64k £24.12k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A