CEFN GOLAU TOGETHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cefn Golau Together is a community organisation, set up to support and improve the well-being of the residents of Cefn Golau and surrounding area. Cefn Golau Together encourages local action and offers volunteering opportunities to residents in a wide range of activities. The organisation is also committed to improving the environment and teaching skills to support sustainable food production.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £10,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Blaenau Gwent
Governance
- 10 May 2021: CIO registration
- Cefn Golau Together (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Williams | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan James | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Hughes | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Mills | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Haydn Leslie Trollope | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.34k | £40.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.09k | £32.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.34k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 01 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 01 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 May 2021 as amended on 10 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
A) THE PREVENTION OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN THE COMMUNITY OF CEFN GOLAU B) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT C) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF CEFN GOLAU AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS D) ) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE') AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME(WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
IN THE COMMUNITY OF CEFN GOLAU
Contact information
- Address:
-
Aneurin Bevan House
40 Castle Street
TREDEGAR
NP22 3DQ
- Phone:
- 01495367684
- Email:
- info@cefntogether.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window