ST MICHAEL'S OVER 60'S CLUB

Charity number: 517056
Charity reporting is overdue by 323 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018
Total gross income £5.14k £5.16k £4.13k £4.13k £5.76k
Total expenditure £4.92k £4.97k £3.71k £3.76k £6.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A