ERSILIA OPEN SOURCE INITIATIVE

Charity number: 1192266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We develop, disseminate and deploy artificial intelligence and machine learning tools to support scientific research in underserved countries, and help them tackle their most pressing health needs. We adhere to the Open Science principles and are focused on developing in-country digital infrastructure and skills to empower scientists in traditionally neglected areas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2021

Total income: £41,553
Total expenditure: £7,177

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 November 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Miquel Duran-Frigola Chair 10 November 2020
None on record
Alacia Armstrong Trustee 14 December 2021
None on record
Akash Rungta Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Dr Edoardo Gaude Trustee 10 November 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2021
Total gross income £41.55k
Total expenditure £7.18k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2021 05 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 05 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
28 BELGRAVE ROAD
CAMBRIDGE
CB1 3DE
Phone:
+447548131982