Trustees PARENTS, STAFF, FRIENDS ASSOCIATION MOUNTSORREL
Charity number: 1193288

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carly Gilmartin | Trustee | 17 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alex Shelton-Knight | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gerry Lindup | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paula Wheatley | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Johnson | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stacy Preston | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dionne Rose Baker | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Charles Clarke | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Baylie Crowson | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louisa May Bird | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anna Louise Burnett Cox | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Evans | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Bedworth | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.