WOODHALL SPA CORONATION HALL TRUST

Charity number: 517086
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 February 2021 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 February 2021 22 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 April 2018 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 13 April 2018 72 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 April 2018 437 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 13 April 2018 437 days late Download