Accounts and annual returns HOUSE OF YOUTH DIALOGUE

Charity number: 1192388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 June 2022 06 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2022 21 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 June 2021 04 April 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2021 21 September 2022 173 days late Download Open in new window