Accounts and annual returns PONTARDULAIS AGRICULTURAL AND HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 517096
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window