Financial history PONTARDULAIS AGRICULTURAL AND HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 517096
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £27.09k £26.63k £32.07k £728 £3.14k
Total expenditure £30.14k £31.93k £27.85k £7.56k £2.21k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A