SEVENOAKS LARDER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FoodBank & distrubution of food
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £8,583 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 17 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gordon Lee | Chair | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Hacon | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
HANNAH BODEK | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrea Watson | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Chandler | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Goretti Efthimiou | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fay Warne | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.21k | £131.61k | £45.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.96k | £75.50k | £57.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.00k | N/A | £8.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, NAMELY THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF THOSE PERSONS IN SEVENOAKS DISTRICT THAT ARE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP. IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A)PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD SUPPLY, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES, AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND ALSO TO OTHER CHARITIES WORKING TO PREVENT POVERTY; AND (B)SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT ADVISORY SERVICES OR INFORMATION AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Mill Lane Centre
Mill Lane
SEVENOAKS
Kent
TN14 5BX
- Phone:
- 07747 133750
- Email:
- sevenoakslarder@gmail.com
- Website:
-
sevenoakslarder.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window