MAIDENHEAD AND TAPLOW UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charitable purpose is to promote the development of young people in achieving their physical, intellectual and social potential as individuals and as responsible citizens by the provision of education and leisure time activities in a structured environment using a nautical theme and in accordance with the principals, ethos and practices of the Marine Society & Sea Cadets (MSSC).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 19 January 2021: CIO registration
- MAIDENHEAD SEA CADETS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW ADAMSON | Chair | 17 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Serena Wheeler | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
monica pannu | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Munn | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Debroy Kenneth Barrett | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Lillywhite | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Hattey | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Westover | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.01k | £23.56k | £26.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.67k | £19.19k | £43.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 19 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE PURPOSE OF THE UNIT (THE PURPOSE) IS TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL AND SOCIAL POTENTIAL AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES USING A NAUTICAL THEME AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES, ETHOS AND PRACTICES OF THE MARINE SOCIETY & SEA CADET(MSSC). IN FURTHERANCE OF THE PURPOSE, THE UNIT MAY: A. OFFER YOUNG PEOPLE A STRUCTURED ENVIRONMENT IN WHICH TO DEVELOP; B. PROVIDE ACCESS TO EDUCATION AND TRAINING INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO): SAILING (INSHORE AND OFFSHORE), PADDLE SPORTS, POWER BOATING, SEAMANSHIP, NAVIGATION, MARINE ENGINEERING, COOKING, MUSIC, FIRST AID, DRILL, PIPING, AND PUBLIC SERVICE; C. PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE TO OBTAIN A RANGE OF QUALIFICATIONS; AND D. PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR COMMUNITY INVOLVEMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Maidenhead Sea Cadets
Mill Lane
Taplow
MAIDENHEAD
Berkshire
SL6 0AA
- Phone:
- 01628623089
- Email:
- maidenheadscc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window