AFRO-CARIBBEAN AND FRIENDS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 517170
Charity reporting is overdue by 1762 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £29.71k £22.47k £25.73k £33.76k £7.60k
Total expenditure £14.76k £17.72k £31.34k £29.25k £13.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A