Financial history CROOKHALL AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 517204
Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.75k £14.14k £853 £16.49k £45.14k
Total expenditure £7.06k £5.17k £10.47k £3.57k £46.06k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A £15.19k £36.72k