Financial history ST MARY'S CHURCH, CLIFTON, GUTTERS, GULLIES AND DRAINS MAINTENANCE FUND

Charity number: 517212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £580 £595 £613 £627 £777
Total expenditure £220 £0 £0 £1.37k £500
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A