Accounts and annual returns FILEY UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 517293
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window