FIBROSUPPORT-WALES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides information and support to those suffering from Fibromyalgia in Wales. It also provides support to carers who need information and support on how to best support loved ones.We also work with medical professionals and other agencies to provide training in fibromyalgia awareness. It also raises awareness of the condition through social media and events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 11 February 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steffan James McMahon | Chair | 11 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Allessi-Richards | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Katherine McMahon | Trustee | 11 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £968 | £804 | £810 | |
|
Total expenditure | £233 | £370 | £353 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 February 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 February 2024 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 April 2023 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 April 2023 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEF THE NEEDS OF THOSE WITH FIBROMYALGIA IN WALES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND SUPPORT TO INDIVIDUALS SUFFERING FROM FIBROMYALGIA AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 Heol-Y-Mynydd
BARGOED
Mid Glamorgan
CF81 8QG
- Phone:
- 03333355241
- Email:
- admin@fswales.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window