FUSION SCAPE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fusion Scape Ltd supports children and their families living in deprived communities in the United Kingdom and abroad by providing advice and assistance on education, the relief of poverty and community development. We bring people together through physical, educational and other activities that support children and families to build strong relationships in and across the different communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brent
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
- Harrow
- Redbridge
- Tower Hamlets
- Bulgaria
- Cameroon
- Ghana
- Romania
Governance
- 15 February 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frank Tweneboa | Chair | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Odoom | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|||||
IKKY GBAA | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ABA UPPON | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
BERTHA TEKYI-ANSAH | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adebayor Onafuwa | Trustee | 03 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAWN HURST | Trustee | 03 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Carly Maybin | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Olga Nkwelle | Trustee | 18 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.96k | £87.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.92k | £63.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 SEP 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 FEB 2022
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: - I. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING ACTIVITIES AND TRAINING THAT DEVELOP THE MENTAL, PHYSICAL, AND MORAL CAPABILITIES OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND FAMILIES LIVING IN SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES, PARTICULARLY THOSE WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM, EASTERN EUROPE, AND SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA. II. TO RELIEVE OF POVERTY FOR CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE, AND FAMILIES BY: A) PROVIDING QUALITY EDUCATION, TRAINING, AND FINANCIAL RESOURCES, GIVING THEM THE OPPORTUNITY TO BUILD CAPACITY AND CONFIDENCE TO RELIEVE THEIR NEEDS AND HELP THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO MAINSTREAM SOCIETY. B) PROMOTING ENTREPRENEURIAL AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISE EDUCATION WITHIN THESE COMMUNITIES AND THE PROVISION OF PRACTICAL SUPPORT BY WAY OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, GUIDANCE, AND TRAINING CONCERNING EMPLOYMENT AND ESTABLISHING AND GROWING A BUSINESS. C) ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF HEALTHCARE PROJECTS THAT HELP TO PREVENT THE SPREAD OF SICKNESS AND DISEASES AS WELL AS PROVIDING THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. III. TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; AND IV. TO SUPPORT SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
85 Great Portland Street
First Floor
London
- Phone:
- +447535687740
- Email:
- projects@fusionscape.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window