OPEN THE BIBLE (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Open the Bible (UK) educates people about the Christian faith, and provides training and resources to church leaders, through its website; social media; audio and printed resources; and by airing radio programmes on Premier Christian Radio in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 May 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND PHILIP KEITH WALTER | Chair | 11 May 2022 |
|
|||||
John C Aiello Jr. | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Beverley Edward Savage | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARIETTE D'CASTRO BSC | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Colin Stuart Smith M.Phil | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANNETTE SMYTH | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|||||
KEITH BRUCE MCKAY | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.28k | £186.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.90k | £129.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 May 2022
Charitable objects
3.1. THE PURPOSES OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING: 3.1.1. RESOURCES WHICH ENABLE CHRISTIAN BELIEVERS TO ENGAGE WITH THE BIBLICAL TEXTS FOR THEMSELVES AND TO SHARE CONFIDENTLY THE ORIGINAL MESSAGE OF THE BIBLE WITH OTHERS; 3.1.2. SUPPORT AND TRAINING RESOURCES FOR CHURCH LEADERS TO EQUIP THEIR OWN CONGREGATIONS TO STUDY AND SHARE THE BIBLE; 3.1.3. EVENTS AND PARTNERSHIPS WITH CHURCHES, WHERE APPROPRIATE. 3.2. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH ANY STATUTORY PROVISION REGARDING THE MEANING OF THE WORD "CHARITABLE" OR THE WORDS "CHARITABLE PURPOSES" IN FORCE IN ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 Shelleycotes Road
Brixworth
Northampton
NN6 9NE
- Phone:
- 01604882040
- Email:
- philwalter@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
openthebible.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window