Trustees DISABILITY WALES / ANABLEDD CYMRU
Charity number: 517391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracey Blockwell | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Aimee Grant | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zanet Papadamaki | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cunqiang Shi | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Louise Shaffer | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angharad Price | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Champ | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Kelvin Jones | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Willow Caroline Holloway | Trustee | 08 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Michael Palmer | Trustee | 21 October 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.