Accounts and annual returns ST THOMAS THE MARTYR TRUST

Charity number: 517401
Charity reporting is overdue by 5 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 5 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 5 days
Annual return 31 July 2021 11 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 30 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 12 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 03 June 2019 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 03 June 2019 3 days late Download Open in new window