Financial history ST THOMAS THE MARTYR TRUST

Charity number: 517401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £76.62k £138.56k £5.57k £24.69k £190
Total expenditure £19.00k £193.21k £10.40k £22.63k £5.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £107.00k N/A N/A N/A