AL HAYAT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offering outstanding educational services, excellent womens facilities, Islamic counselling and a youth club alongside a fully functioning Mosque with daily prayer services, Al-Hayat Centre is the perfect place to foster the hearts and minds of British Muslims in the South East.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 February 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rizwan Hussain | Chair | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
IMRAN HUSSAIN | Trustee | 02 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sabir Hussain | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.16k | £55.40k | £60.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.71k | £31.87k | £43.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 05 December 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 05 December 2024 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 175 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 226 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 January 2022
(These accounts |
14 July 2023 | 226 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
A. TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF MEETINGS, LECTURES [PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS] PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON AND TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC RELIGION. THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Al-Hayat Centre
Unit 1-3
Dukes Road
Southampton
SO14 0SQ
- Phone:
- 07518968375
- Email:
- info@alhayatcentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window