Hackathons UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to further tech education through student focussed Hackathons. We are an organisation specialising in both running and supporting student focussed hackathons, which allow students to gain hands-on experience and develop a range of skills outside the classroom.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 July 2021: Standard registration
- HACKATHONS UK (Working name)
- HACKATHONS UK LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eve Routledge | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karl James Southern | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Charles Sawyer | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joe Nash | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Erin Jane Osher | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.54k | £13.55k | £7.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.13k | £11.42k | £9.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 OCT 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 JUL 2021 as amended on 02 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN TECHNOLOGY AND ENGINEERING, IN PARTICULAR IN THE FIELD OF INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY AND SOFTWARE DEVELOPMENT, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ORGANISING OR ASSISTING IN THE ORGANISATION OF EDUCATIONAL HACKATHONS (COLLABORATIVE COMPUTER PROGRAMMING AND HARDWARE ENGINEERING EVENTS AND COMPETITIONS DIRECTED TO DEVELOPING THE KNOWLEDGE AND SKILLS OF PARTICIPANTS) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wraysbury Hall, Ferry Lane
STAINES-UPON-THAMES
Berkshire
TW19 6HG
- Phone:
- +44 300 131 3880
- Email:
- hello@hackathons.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window