John Port Spencer Academy Parent Teacher Association

Charity number: 517440
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £2.53k £7.94k £8.71k £10.63k £3.92k
Total expenditure £1.16k £5.95k £9.27k £10.32k £5.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A