John Port Spencer Academy Parent Teacher Association

Charity number: 517440
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anna Kelynack-Boddy Trustee 11 November 2020 None on record
Valerie Hobson Trustee 11 November 2020 None on record
Liz Crookes Trustee 01 December 2015 None on record
Caroline Jane Sayer Trustee 17 November 2021 None on record
Victoria Blackshaw Trustee 13 May 2019 None on record
Bregje Fisk Trustee 22 November 2017 None on record
JENIFER SILVESTER Chair 01 December 2015 None on record
Laura O'Brien Trustee 22 November 2017 None on record