SOUTH YORKSHIRE ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity number: 517441
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 November 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 November 2021 7 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 November 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 November 2020 18 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 November 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 November 2019 1 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required