FLAME INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Flame International has a vision to see people set free from the pain and trauma of war, terror or oppression - releasing God's healing, forgiveness and reconciliation. We gather, train and equip appropriate mission teams to work with local leaders, broken communities and nations to achieve our vision.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Armenia
- Uganda
Governance
- 01 September 2021: Standard registration
- 06 December 2021: Funds received from 1096374 FLAME INTERNATIONAL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Major Nicholas Robert Douglas Shenow | Chair | 22 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Chris New | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Elizabeth Borland | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lieutenant Colonel Janice Louise Ransom MBE | Trustee | 12 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
BRIGADIER VALERIE BACHELOR MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.30k | £244.68k | £262.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.71k | £260.31k | £258.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 JAN 2021 as amended on 01 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT ('THE OBJECT') WHICH IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH) THE PROVISION OF HEALING CONFERENCES, PRAYER MEETINGS AND TRAUMA WORKSHOPS IN COUNTRIES WHICH HAVE BEEN AFFECTED BY WAR, TERROR OR OPPRESSION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAME INTERNATIONAL
PO BOX 424 PO BOX
ALDERSHOT
GU11 9ER
- Phone:
- 01252336509
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window