Financial history HOLMFIRTH CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 517460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £11.38k £11.25k £12.11k £10.87k £1.58k
Total expenditure £10.97k £11.64k £12.84k £8.81k £325
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A