THE LITERARY INSTITUTE CULTURAL COMMUNITY HUB

Charity number: 1193897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision and maintenance of a community hub for the benefit of people who live, work and study in Egham and the surrounding area without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, including use for: (a) meetings, lectures and classes, and (b) other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupations, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Total income: £22,096
Total expenditure: £9,433

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 March 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • ATTHELIT (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Clair Bonnett Trustee 26 July 2022
None on record
Dr Brian Frank Perry BEM Trustee 04 March 2021
CHERTSEY & ADDLESTONE GOOD NEIGHBOURS
Recently registered
David Knight Trustee 04 March 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2022
Total gross income £22.10k
Total expenditure £9.43k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Literary Institute
51 High Street
Egham
Surrey
TW20 9EW
Phone:
07835955409