CLEFT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the suffering of and promote and protect the physical and mental health of patients affected by cleft lip and palate and related conditions by supporting research and through the provision of support, education, practical advice and financial assistance to clinics in lower and middle income countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
52 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
- Egypt
- India
- Iraq
- Mozambique
- Nepal
- Pakistan
- Sierra Leone
- Sri Lanka
- Uganda
Governance
- 25 May 2021: CIO registration
- 04 October 2021: Funds received from 1119630 CLEFT
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN SOMMERLAD | Chair | 14 May 2007 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Qattan | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Carrick | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shonnelly Novintan | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rona Caroline Slator | Trustee | 14 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
David George Christopher Sainsbury | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Fell | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Richard | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr TIM GOODACRE | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marie Pinkstone | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tracy Morris | Trustee | 11 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ALLAN | Trustee | 02 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £413.81k | £349.08k | £249.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.45k | £167.54k | £305.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 May 2021
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF AND PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PATIENTS AFFECTED BY CLEFT LIP AND PALATE AND RELATED CONDITIONS BY SUPPORTING RESEARCH IN DESIGNATED CLEFT CENTRES WITHIN THE UK AND IN OVERSEAS CENTRES SUPPORTED BY CLEFT INTO THE CAUSES AND METHODS OF TREATMENTS AVAILABLE. 2) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE AFFECTED BY CLEFT LIP AND PALATE AND RELATED CONDITIONS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE TO CLINICAL WORKING IN LOW AND MIDDLE INCOME COUNTRIES AS DETERMINED BY THE WORLD BANK LIST OF ECONOMIES (OR EQUIVALENT) FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10a Warren Estate
Lordship Road
WRITTLE
CHELMSFORD
CM1 3WT
- Phone:
- 01245421901
- Email:
- info@cleft.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window