Accounts and annual returns KING EDWARD MUSICAL SOCIETY OF MACCLESFIELD

Charity number: 517554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2022 25 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 25 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 14 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 01 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 01 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 23 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 23 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 18 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window