APPY’S AID EMPOWERING YOUNG WOMEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Appys aid is a small non-profit organisation, that aims to promote and advance the education (including social & physical training) of underprivileged females [under the age of 25 years] in Punjab, by: Awarding to such persons educational scholarships, allowances or grants Providing educational aids (e.g. books, computers, stationary) Promoting health and hygiene (clean water, sanitary pads)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- India
Governance
- 07 January 2022: Standard registration
- APPY’S AID (Working name)
- APPY'S AID (Previous name)
- APPY'S AID, EMPOWERING AND EDUCATING YOUNG WOMEN (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jasmine Quick | Chair | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Quick | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kirandeep Brar-Sacha | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anisha Quick | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tejbir Sacha | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 09 December 2024 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 09 December 2024 | 404 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 FEB 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF UNDERPRIVILEGED FEMALES UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN PUNJAB, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: 1. AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION; 2. PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT; 3. PROVIDING AIDS TO ASSIST THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING BOOKS, COMPUTERS, STATIONERY AND SCHOOL UNIFORM ETC.); 4. PROMOTING HEALTH AND HYGIENE (ENSURING STUDENTS HAVE ACCESS TO A CLEAN WATER SUPPLY AND FOOD, ENCOURAGING SPORTING ACTIVITIES AND PROVIDING SANITARY NAPKINS TO HELP THE GIRLS ATTEND SCHOOL WITH DIGNITY.)
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
GLENDALE
11 HORNYOLD ROAD
MALVERN
WR14 1QQ
- Phone:
- 07810706479
- Email:
- appys.aid@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window