THRUMPTON KIDS CLUBS

Charity number: 1193767
Regulatory alert
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lorraine Moseley Trustee 10 March 2021 None on record
Claire Heggie Trustee 02 April 2015 None on record
Emma Baker Trustee 11 March 2019
THRUMPTON KIDS CLUBS Received: On time
SHARON NICHOLSON Trustee 10 March 2021 None on record
Susan Keeling Trustee 14 May 2019 None on record
Simon Baker Trustee 11 March 2019
THRUMPTON KIDS CLUBS Received: On time
MICHELLE Roberts Chair 01 July 2007
THRUMPTON KIDS CLUBS Received: On time
Bethany Hare Trustee 25 June 2018 None on record
Emma McFarlane Trustee 27 March 2015
THRUMPTON KIDS CLUBS Received: On time