Trustees THE SIGRID RAUSING TRUST
Charity number: 1194828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIGRID MARIA ELISABET RAUSING | Chair | 22 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Daniel Jakob Anders Hotz | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Baroness Helena Ann Kennedy | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sir Jeffrey Jowell KCMG QC | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Puddephatt | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hosh Ibrahim | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Mailman | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Stone | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.