Governing document THE SWANSEA ASTRONOMICAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 517700
Charity reporting is overdue by 51 days
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1948 AS AMENDED 1977 ,10 APRIL 1986, 10 OCTOBER 1996, 25 SEPTEMBER 1997, 10 OCTOBER 1998, 22 MAY 2003,
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO FURTHER THE KNOWLEDGE OF AND TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE SCIENCE OF ASTRONOMY ALSO TO PROMOTE AND CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO ALL PROBLEMS RELATED THERETO.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
SWANSEA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.